TN SB0910 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 501
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 501
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes it a Class C misdemeanor for a person to sell or distribute an electronic cigarette to another person who has not attained 18 years of age or to purchase an electronic cigarette on behalf of such person under 18 years of age. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 15 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, makes it a Class C misdemeanor for a person to sell or distribute an electronic cigarette to another person who has not attained 18 years of age or to purchase an electronic cigarette on behalf of such person under 18 years of age. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 15 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 501 | |
2011-05-21 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0353) | |
2011-05-21 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/21/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | S. Reset on cal. for 5/21/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 3 cal. for 5/20/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/20/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | S. Reset on Cal. for 5/20/2011 | |
2011-05-13 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/16/2011 | |
2011-05-02 | S. Reset on Cal. for 5/16/2011 | |
2011-04-29 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/2/2011 | |
2011-04-26 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-19 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 4/19/2011 | |
2011-02-23 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1729 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-21 - Pub. Ch. 501