TN SB0970 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-08 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-08 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends the period within which a nonprofit that partners with TWRA for marketing opportunities must file an annual report of their operation and accomplishments from 90 days after the end of their fiscal year to 100 days after the end of their fiscal year. - Amends TCA Title 69, Chapter 9 and Title 70.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 69, Chapter 9 and Title 70, relative to wildlife resources.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Powers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/8/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0797 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-02 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.