TN SB0994 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Pub. Ch. 175
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Pub. Ch. 175
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the governor to include an allocation to the reserve for revenue fluctuations equal to an amount sufficient to maintain the reserve at 8 percent, instead of 5 or 10 percent, of estimated state tax revenues allocated to the general fund and the education trust fund, or at 8 percent of the estimated growth in state tax revenues to such funds, whichever amount is lesser. - Amends TCA Title 9.
Title
As enacted, requires the governor to include an allocation to the reserve for revenue fluctuations equal to an amount sufficient to maintain the reserve at 8 percent, instead of 5 or 10 percent, of estimated state tax revenues allocated to the general fund and the education trust fund, or at 8 percent of the estimated growth in state tax revenues to such funds, whichever amount is lesser. - Amends TCA Title 9.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | House | Pub. Ch. 175 |
2013-04-29 | House | Effective date(s) 07/01/2013 |
2013-04-23 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2013-04-18 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2013-04-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-04-17 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-04-16 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2013-04-15 | House | S. concurred in H. am. 1 |
2013-04-11 | House | Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/15/2013 |
2013-04-10 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 1 |
2013-04-10 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0270) |
2013-04-10 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 27, Nays 2 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/14/2013 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 3/12/2013 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 3/12/2013 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 3/5/2013 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 3/5/2013 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 2/26/2013 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0330 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 175