TN SB1060 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces from 90 to 60 days, the period in which a dealer via signed statement can deduct on a return sales tax collected but not yet remitted to the commissioner of revenue for refunded items. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, relative to taxation.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Revenue Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0986 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-22 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.