TN SB1118 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Pub. Ch. 222
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Pub. Ch. 222
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes exclusion for Davidson County to allow Davidson County, like other cities and counties under law, to delegate its public housing authority the power to negotiate and accept payments in lieu of taxes from lessees that operate publicly owned low-income tax credit property. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 20, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, removes exclusion for Davidson County to allow Davidson County, like other cities and counties under law, to delegate its public housing authority the power to negotiate and accept payments in lieu of taxes from lessees that operate publicly owned low-income tax credit property. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 20, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Pub. Ch. 222 | |
2015-04-30 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2015 | |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-04-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-04-06 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2015-04-06 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-03-23 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/19/2015 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0732 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 222