TN SB1147 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Effective date(s) 05/17/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Effective date(s) 05/17/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits this state and its political subdivisions from adopting or implementing policy recommendations that deliberately or inadvertently infringe or restrict private property rights without due process, as may be required by policy recommendations originating in, or traceable to, "Agenda 21," adopted by the United Nations in 1992 at its Conference on Environment and Development, the 2030 Agenda for Sustainable Development and the U.N.'s proposal to reach net zero emissions by 2050, or any other international law or ancillary plan of action that contravenes the constitution of the United States or the constitution of this state. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 66 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 66 and Title 68, relative to private property rights.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Niceley [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Effective date(s) 05/17/2023 | |
2023-05-24 | Pub. Ch. 479 | |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2023-05-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2023-04-21 | House | Passed H., Ayes 66, Nays 22, PNV 1 |
2023-04-21 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0392) |
2023-04-21 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2023-04-19 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 25, Nays 6 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0291) |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/17/2023 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/17/2023 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/10/2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/20/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/14/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1346 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 479