TN SB1236 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits abortions from the point a fetal heartbeat is detected; creates exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 2 and Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, prohibits abortions from the point a fetal heartbeat is detected; creates exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 2 and Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Deferred to Summer Study (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/3/2020 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Motion to Recall from Committee Tabled, voice vote |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Notice to Recall from Committee Filed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Deferred to Summer Study |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/9/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/9/2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0077 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-11 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration