TN SB1352 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts the retail sale of food and food ingredients from the sales tax if sold to a person who is 70 years of age or older during the period beginning July 1, 2023, and ending September 30, 2023. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-228 and Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 67-6-228 and Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3, relative to taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0243 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee