TN SB1358 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires franchise holders, and certificated providers, that provide broadband service to file on or before July 1, 2023, and by July 1 of the two subsequent years thereafter, a map or other information with the appropriate regulatory entity indicating the specific locations where the provider offered broadband service that is capable of delivering download speeds of at least 100 Mbps and upload speeds of at least 20 Mbps. - Amends TCA Title 7 and Title 65.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7 and Title 65, relative to broadband services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/20/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/14/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0943 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee