TN SB1434 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-26 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C,L&A Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-26 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C,L&A Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires payor banks to process items sequentially as indicated by the numbers on the bank drafts on the day items are charged against a customer's account; places limits on handling charges for insufficient funds if items are not processed sequentially. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 4, Part 4.
Title
As introduced, requires payor banks to process items sequentially as indicated by the numbers on the bank drafts on the day items are charged against a customer's account; places limits on handling charges for insufficient funds if items are not processed sequentially. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 4, Part 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-19 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 4/19/2011 | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2011-02-23 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1936 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-20 - Action Def. in s/c Commerce Subcommittee to summer study
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1434&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB1434.pdf |