TN SB1468 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-02 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-02 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, directs the Tennessee advisory committee on intergovernmental relations to perform a study of the overall severity and effect of litter on the maintenance and natural resources of state parks, and to report the committee's findings to each member of the general assembly and the legislative librarian. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 11; Title 39, Chapter 14, Part 5; Title 54; Title 68 and Title 69.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 11; Title 39, Chapter 14, Part 5; Title 54; Title 68 and Title 69, relative to litter.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-02 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1122 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-09 - Sponsor(s) withdrawn.