TN SB1474 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Trans. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Trans. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, redefines "amusement device" to include go karts used for a commercial purpose; authorizes regulation of go karts used for a commercial purpose by the elevator and amusement device safety board. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 121, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, redefines "amusement device" to include go karts used for a commercial purpose; authorizes regulation of go karts used for a commercial purpose by the elevator and amusement device safety board. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 121, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Overbey [R] | Rep. Dale Carr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Trans. Comm. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Trans & Safety Comm. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1489 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-05 - Failed In: Business and Utilities Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1474&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB1474.pdf |