TN SB1536 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 717
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 717
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes applicable to Coffee County, present law that provides that whenever Hardeman County or Cumberland County acquires property at a tax sale, a nongovernmental entity holding a vested and duly recorded contractual right to the payment of fees or assessments secured by such property retains such right; makes applicable to Coffee County, present law that limits such nongovernmental entity to only enforce such contractual rights against the applicable county through the exercise of its lien rights; provided, however, that the applicable county is liable for the payment of the fees and assessments if the county makes actual use of the property. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 20 and Title 67, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 29, Chapter 20 and Title 67, Chapter 5, relative to property bought by a county at a tax sale.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 717 | |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Refer to Senate Desk for introduction |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Refer to Senate Delayed Bills Committee |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1535 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-22 - Effective date(s) 04/16/2024