TN SB1571 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 37
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 37
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, authorizes purchasing limits for which competitive bids are not required be set by ordinance pursuant to state law requirements. - to amend.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 29 of the Private Acts of 2021; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the Town of Pleasant Hill.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 37 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 3/11/2024 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1581 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-03 - Pr. Ch. 37