TN SB1586 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Pub. Ch. 518
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Pub. Ch. 518
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, codifies the Acts of the 2019 regular session.
Title
As enacted, codifies the Acts of the 2019 regular session.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Pub. Ch. 518 | |
2020-03-16 | Effective date(s) 03/06/2020 | |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-02-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-02-20 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2020-02-20 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-02-10 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/3/2020 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 1/30/2020 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 1/28/2020 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1693 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 518