TN SB1640 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 16 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 16 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, continues permanent rules filed with the secretary of state between January 1, 2023, and December 31, 2023, that are in effect on the effective date of this act until repealed or amended by subsequent rule of the appropriate rulemaking agency or until otherwise superseded by legislative enactment. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT relative to agency rules scheduled to expire pursuant to the provisions of the Uniform Administrative Procedures Act, compiled in Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-15 | House | Passed H., Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-04-15 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0791) |
2024-04-15 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-28 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0757) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1783 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-15 - Comp. SB subst.