TN SB1647 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides a 25 percent discount on the tuition charged by a state institution of higher education to the child of an active or retired member of the Tennessee army national guard or the Tennessee air national guard. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 7, relative to tuition discounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-07 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/7/2024 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1929 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Administration