TN SB1762 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires TennCare coverage of rapid whole genome sequencing when certain clinical criteria are met. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71, relative to coverage of rapid whole genome sequencing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-24 | House | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-04-24 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0550) |
2024-04-24 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-18 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0534) |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/9/2024 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/13/2024 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1826 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.