TN SB1810 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 17 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 17 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a request made by a student to an employee of the student's LEA or public charter school for an accommodation to affirm the student's gender identity to be reported to a school administrator and to the student's parent; prohibits an employee of an LEA or public charter school from knowingly providing false or misleading information to a student's parent regarding the student's gender identity or intention to transition to a gender that differs from the student's sex at the time of birth; authorizes civil actions to be filed by parents and by the attorney general and reporter against a noncompliant LEA or public charter school. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to K-12 education.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] |
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 27, Nays 3 (Amendment 1 - HA0944) |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-15 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 73, Nays 23, PNV 1 |
2024-04-15 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0944) |
2024-04-15 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-25 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 23, Nays 6 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0694) |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2165 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-15 - Sponsor(s) Added.