TN SB1831 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Failed in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee - no second
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Failed in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee - no second
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits consumer reporting agencies from including on a consumer report a record of a medical debt judgment that is filed in this state; requires a healthcare provider or facility that accepts public funds as compensation for losses due to providing uncompensated care to ensure that an amount of outstanding patient debt equal to the amount of public funds accepted is designated as satisfied and that patient is notified of such satisfied debt; prohibits the healthcare provider or facility from seeking a judgment or taking other legal action to collect from the debtor any portion of such debt that is so designated. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 8; Title 16; Title 18; Title 20; Title 21; Title 27; Title 28; Title 29; Title 33; Title 45; Title 47; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 9, Chapter 8; Title 16; Title 18; Title 20; Title 21; Title 27; Title 28; Title 29; Title 33; Title 45; Title 47; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to healthcare costs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | Senate | Failed in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee - no second |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/20/2024 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1957 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-30 - Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee