TN SB1889 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the authority to report quarterly to each member of the general assembly information relating to grants, tax credits, and other funds distributed through the authority, the resources utilized by the authority to facilitate such distributions, and information relating to mechanisms by which the public may apply for and access such distributions. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 6, Chapter 58; Title 9 and Title 13, Chapter 20.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 6, Chapter 58; Title 9 and Title 13, Chapter 20, relative to the Tennessee housing development authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1849 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-14 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Government Committee