TN SB1894 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 17 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 17 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a business that makes an automatic renewal offer or continuous service offer to a consumer to obtain affirmative consent to the agreement containing the automatic renewal offer terms or continuous service offer terms no less than 60 days before the business charges the consumer's credit or debit card, or the consumer's account through a third party. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 47, Chapter 18, relative to automatic renewal of subscription services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 3 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 3 BY FREEMAN PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY FREEMAN PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 3 BY FREEMAN PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY FREEMAN PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 (Amendment 3 - HA1028) |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-15 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 86, Nays 7, PNV 1 |
2024-04-15 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA1009) |
2024-04-15 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA1028) |
2024-04-15 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0746) |
2024-04-15 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-25 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0709) |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1832 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-15 - Sponsor(s) Added.