TN SB1970 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the Tennessee wildlife resources agency to enter into license agreements for the operation of facilities on lands under the control or supervision of the agency for the improved utilization of state lands and facilities; such license agreements must first be approved by the state building commission and the attorney general and reporter. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17 and Title 70.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17 and Title 70, relative to wildlife resources.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2137 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-31 - Withdrawn.