TN SB1987 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 719
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 719
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates “Rockin' Around the Christmas Tree” by Brenda Lee as the official state holiday song; requires the secretary of state to include the song in the Tennessee Blue Book. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1, Part 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 1, Part 3, relative to state songs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 719 | |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2024 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/18/2024 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/11/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/11/2024 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/4/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/27/2024 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1613 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-22 - Effective date(s) 04/16/2024