TN SB2026 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires at least one driver license testing station that conducts commercial driver license (CDL) tests to be located in each grand division of the state. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 50.
Title
As introduced, requires at least one driver license testing station that conducts commercial driver license (CDL) tests to be located in each grand division of the state. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 50.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1888 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee of Transportation Committee