TN SB2063 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 24 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 24 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a pilot project to place a moratorium on the loss of public assistance benefits for child care workers based solely on wage increases that cause their income to exceed program eligibility limits; requires TACIR to study wages and related issues for child care workers, including the benefits cliff. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49 and Title 71, relative to public benefits for child care workers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 74 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 74, Nays 15, PNV 3 |
2024-04-22 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0854) |
2024-04-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-04 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0796) |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/28/2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 2/28/2024 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/21/2024 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2232 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-22 - Sponsor(s) Added.