TN SB2067 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a pilot project for in-state tuition being available at board of regents higher education institutions in Shelby County for certain immigrants. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 58; Title 49, Chapter 7; Title 49, Chapter 8 and Title 49, Chapter 9.
Title
As introduced, creates a pilot project for in-state tuition being available at board of regents higher education institutions in Shelby County for certain immigrants. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 58; Title 49, Chapter 7; Title 49, Chapter 8 and Title 49, Chapter 9.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2328 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-25 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2067&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB2067.pdf |