TN SB2067 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes issuance of an antique motor vehicle license plate to farm trucks older than 25 years old that are used for certain agricultural or horticultural purposes and not for general transportation. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 1 and Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55, Chapter 1 and Title 55, Chapter 4, relative to antique motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/21/2024 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2128 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee