TN SB2082 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Resilient Tennessee Revolving Loan Fund Act." - Amends TCA Title 58, Chapter 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 58, Chapter 2, relative to the establishment of the Resilient Tennessee Revolving Loan Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Page Walley [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2024 | |
2024-04-17 | Pub. Ch. 686 | |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-01 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2024-04-01 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-07 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/4/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/13/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1684 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 686