TN SB2092 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Effective date(s) 03/12/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Effective date(s) 03/12/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes ex officio members of the Tennessee commission for the United States semiquincentennial commission to appoint designees to serve on the commission; transfers the administrative attachment for the commission from the department of tourist development to the Tennessee State Museum. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 44.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 44, relative to the Tennessee Commission for the United States Semiquicentennial Commission Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Effective date(s) 03/12/2024 | |
2024-03-19 | Pub. Ch. 562 | |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-02-29 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-02-26 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-02-26 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-02-26 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/22/2024 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/13/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1693 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 562