TN SB2094 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 532
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 532
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires an employer to report to the bureau of workers’ compensation each accident that results in a work-related death or personal injury within 14 calendar days of the date the employer is notified of the accident or has knowledge of the accident, whichever is earlier, instead of reporting accidents at different intervals based upon the nature of the injury and whether the injured employee is able to return within seven days of the accident; and makes other changes relative to workers’ compensation. - Amends TCA Section 50-3-702; Title 50, Chapter 6 and Chapter 189 of the Public Acts of 2021.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 50-3-702; Title 50, Chapter 6 and Chapter 189 of the Public Acts of 2021, relative to workers' compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 532 | |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/22/2024 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/13/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1694 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Effective date(s) 06/30/2024, 07/01/2024