TN SB2151 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner of health to submit an electronic copy of the annual report on immunization rates of children, by county, to the governor and the speakers of the senate and the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 14; Title 37, Chapter 10, Part 4; Title 49 and Title 63.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 14; Title 37, Chapter 10, Part 4; Title 49 and Title 63, relative to public health.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Frank Niceley [R] | Sen. Shane Reeves [R] |
Sen. Page Walley [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-23 | House | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 69, Nays 24 PNV 1 |
2024-04-22 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted |
2024-04-18 | House | Conf. comm. appointed. (Carringer, Terry, Hawk, Davis, Shaw) |
2024-04-18 | House | H. refused to recede from H am. no. 1 |
2024-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/18/2024 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed (Johnson, Massey, Crowe, Oliver, Yager). |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from amendment 1 (HA-0858) |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-15 | House | H. refused to recede from am. no. 1 SB2151 |
2024-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate refused to concur in amendment |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/10/2024 |
2024-04-08 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 72, Nays 19, PNV 1 |
2024-04-08 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0858) |
2024-04-08 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-25 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 25, Nays 5 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0697) |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2861 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Sponsor(s) Added.