TN SB2186 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 786
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 786
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that in a county with more than one general sessions judge in which the judicial commissioners are supervised by the general sessions judges, the management and supervision of any judicial commissioners appointed pursuant to this section must rotate between the general sessions judges having criminal jurisdiction in the county on an annual basis. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 17 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 16; Title 17 and Title 40, relative to judicial commissioners.
Sponsors
Sen. Brent Taylor [R] | Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 786 | |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/8/2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/18/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/11/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1716 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-01 - Effective date(s) 04/23/2024