TN SB2188 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes, from August 1 of each year to before July 31 of each year, the date by which the name, address, and telephone number of the person designated to check a bus or vehicle for children at stops under the Tennessee Children with Disabilities Transportation Act must be sent to the appropriate LEA. - Amends TCA Title 29; Title 49 and Title 54.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 29; Title 49 and Title 54, relative to transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-16 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-11 | House | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-04-11 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0885) |
2024-04-11 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-21 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0683) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2384 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-11 - Comp. SB subst.