TN SB2202 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 732
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 732
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes various changes to state law to reflect the change in federal law that raised the minimum age to purchase tobacco products from 18 years of age to 21 years of age. - Amends TCA Section 1-3-113; Title 39, Chapter 15 and Title 39, Chapter 17.
Title
As enacted, makes various changes to state law to reflect the change in federal law that raised the minimum age to purchase tobacco products from 18 years of age to 21 years of age. - Amends TCA Section 1-3-113; Title 39, Chapter 15 and Title 39, Chapter 17.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] |
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] | Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] | Sen. Katrina Robinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 1 (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 23 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 23 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Pub. Ch. 732 | |
2020-07-02 | Effective date(s) 01/01/2021 | |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0, PNV 2 (Amendment 1 - HA0641) |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-08 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 64, Nays 24, PNV 6 |
2020-06-02 | House | Reset on cal. for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0641) |
2020-06-02 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-03-12 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 25, Nays 5, PNV 1 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/9/2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2269 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 732