TN SB2208 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates tax exemption for portions of property that provide tree canopy cover in counties whose local governing bodies elect to create the exemption. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6 and Title 67, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 6 and Title 67, Chapter 5, relative to tree canopies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2319 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Government Committee