TN SB2223 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Second Amendment Financial Privacy Act," which prohibits a financial institution from requiring the usage of a merchant code that distinguishes a firearms retailer from a general merchandise retailer or a sporting goods retailer and from disclosing a financial record collected in violation of the prohibition. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 6; Title 29; Title 38; Title 39; Title 45 and Title 47.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 6; Title 29; Title 38; Title 39; Title 45 and Title 47, relative to merchant codes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 75 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 75 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 27, Nays 3 (Amendment 1 - HA0745) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/10/2024 |
2024-04-01 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 75, Nays 17, PNV 2 |
2024-04-01 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0745) |
2024-04-01 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-25 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 25, Nays 5 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0719) |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2762 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-01 - Sponsor(s) Added.