TN SB2285 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes firefighters, law enforcement officers, and emergency medical services personnel who are members of the Tennessee consolidated retirement system to be reemployed after retirement without having to wait a period of time after retirement; requires the member to be rehired at a rate or salary equivalent to that of a member with no experience based on the position for which the member is hired. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 36, Part 8 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 36, Part 8 and Title 49, relative to reemployment after retirement.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Lowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2476 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-22 - Withdrawn.