TN SB2293 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 16 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 16 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner to include in the annual block grant report information detailing the department's use of federal TANF funds in furtherance of the four purposes of the TANF program. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 71, Chapter 1, Part 1, relative to temporary assistance for needy families (TANF).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-15 | House | Passed H., Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2024-04-15 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-10 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/8/2024 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1975 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-15 - Comp. SB subst.