TN SB2337 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the penalty for indecent exposure from a Class A misdemeanor to a Class E felony if the person was confined in a penal institution at the time of the commission of the offense and the offense was committed with the intent to abuse, torment, harass, or embarrass a guard or staff member; requires a mandatory minimum sentence of 14 days of incarceration; requires the mandatory minimum sentence to be served consecutive to any sentence being served at the time of the commission of the offense; requires a person convicted of more than one violation of this offense to serve each sentence consecutive to any other sentence imposed. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, relative to indecent exposure.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Sen. Page Walley [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 77 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-24 | House | Passed H., Ayes 77, Nays 18, PNV 1 |
2024-04-24 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-21 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/11/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1924 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.