TN SB2375 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 992
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 992
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes zoning consideration of temporary family healthcare structures; adds a requirement that, as part of the plan to expand cost-effective community-based residential alternatives to institutional care as required by the Long-Term Care Community Choices Act of 2008, the bureau of TennCare must seek written guidance from the centers for Medicare and Medicaid services regarding whether a temporary family healthcare structure may be covered in whole or in part under the program established by the Long-Term Care Community Choices Act of 2008. - Amends TCA Title 13; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, authorizes zoning consideration of temporary family healthcare structures; adds a requirement that, as part of the plan to expand cost-effective community-based residential alternatives to institutional care as required by the Long-Term Care Community Choices Act of 2008, the bureau of TennCare must seek written guidance from the centers for Medicare and Medicaid services regarding whether a temporary family healthcare structure may be covered in whole or in part under the program established by the Long-Term Care Community Choices Act of 2008. - Amends TCA Title 13; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Mark Green [R] |
Sen. Dolores Gresham [R] | Sen. Kerry Roberts [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Pub. Ch. 992 | |
2016-05-02 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2016 | |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-04-20 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-04-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-04-18 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1114) |
2016-04-18 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2016-04-14 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0981) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/11/2016 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/11/2016 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/7/2016 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee to 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/29/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2040 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 992