TN SB2375 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes the county election commission to notify individuals filing a petition for recall, referendum, or initiative to notify the individuals of any defects in the petition that must be cured prior to certification for final approval. - Amends TCA Title 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes the county election commission to notify individuals filing a petition for recall, referendum, or initiative to notify the individuals of any defects in the petition that must be cured prior to certification for final approval. - Amends TCA Title 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/10/2020
2020-02-25SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/3/2020
2020-02-19SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/25/2020
2020-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2020-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2467 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback