TN SB2408 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - Refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - Refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the state office of vital records to electronically submit to the coordinator of elections its monthly report of persons 18 years of age or older who have died in this state. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 2, Part 1 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 2, Part 1 and Title 40, relative to voting.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | Senate | Refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Recalled from Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2155 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-10 - Sponsor(s) Added.