TN SB2410 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-12 - Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 5, Nays 4 PNV 0
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-12 - Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 5, Nays 4 PNV 0
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, directs the comptroller of the treasury to audit the funding for the implementation of common core state standards and all components of PARCC, with cooperation from the department of education and the state board of education; requires the comptroller to audit the race to the top funding; requires a report of findings and recommendations to the education committees by July 1, 2015. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, directs the comptroller of the treasury to audit the funding for the implementation of common core state standards and all components of PARCC, with cooperation from the department of education and the state board of education; requires the comptroller to audit the race to the top funding; requires a report of findings and recommendations to the education committees by July 1, 2015. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 5, Nays 4 PNV 0 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/12/2014 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2333 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-25 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee