TN SB2427 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Effective date(s) 03/31/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Effective date(s) 03/31/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, excludes narcotic testing equipment used to determine whether a controlled substance contains a synthetic opioid from the definition of "drug paraphernalia"; exclusion does not apply if the equipment is possessed for purposes of a person's commission of a drug-related offense; exclusion repealed July 1, 2025. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-402.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 39-17-402, relative to testing equipment used to determine the presence of a synthetic opioid.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] |
Sen. Shane Reeves [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 2 PNV 1 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 2 PNV 1 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Effective date(s) 03/31/2022 | |
2022-04-04 | Pub. Ch. 764 | |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-03-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-03-17 | House | Passed H., Ayes 82, Nays 9, PNV 0 |
2022-03-17 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0589) |
2022-03-17 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-03-07 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 3 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0506) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/3/2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 2 PNV 1 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/15/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2177 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 764