TN SB2441 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 818
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 818
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the board of chiropractic examiners, June 30, 2013. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 63, Chapter 4, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, extends the board of chiropractic examiners, June 30, 2013. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 63, Chapter 4, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. CONSENT: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. CONSENT: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Pub. Ch. 818 | |
2010-05-04 | Effective date(s) 04/23/10 | |
2010-04-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-04-19 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-04-19 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-04-15 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-04-13 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-04-12 | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 1 | |
2010-04-12 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2010-02-11 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2010-02-10 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-02-10 | Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 0 | |
2010-02-09 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 02/10/2010 | |
2010-02-03 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Consent cal. for 02/03/2010 | |
2010-01-25 | P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. | |
2010-01-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2589 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 818