TN SB2448 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, lowers from $610 to $300 the maximum fee for the interment of an eligible veteran's spouse. - Amends TCA Title 46, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, lowers from $610 to $300 the maximum fee for the interment of an eligible veteran's spouse. - Amends TCA Title 46, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Harris [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 1017 | |
2018-05-23 | Effective date(s) 05/21/2018 | |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-05-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-25 | House | Passed H., Ayes 85, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-25 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1308 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1017