TN SB2508 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 17 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 17 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires, on or before January 1, 2025, the department of revenue to report to the finance, ways and means committees of both houses the total amount of moneys received under law relative to property tax in fiscal years 2023 and 2024 from the sales of tickets, fees, or other charges made for admission to performance venues in this state, and the revenue effect of exempting dues, fees, or other charges made on or for the admission of the public to television, film, radio, or theatrical presentations. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9; Title 12; Title 13; Title 57; Title 62; Title 66; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9; Title 12; Title 13; Title 57; Title 62; Title 66; Title 67 and Title 68, relative to performance venues.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] | Sen. Heidi Campbell [D] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] |
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Adam Lowe [R] | Sen. Charlane Oliver [D] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-16 | House | Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 4, PNV 1 |
2024-04-16 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0972) |
2024-04-16 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0793) |
2024-04-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-15 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0765) |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA1002) |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/9/2024 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2712 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-16 - Sponsor(s) Added.