TN SB2521 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows a retired member of the Tennessee consolidated retirement system or of a local retirement fund to be reemployed as a full-time school resource officer at a public school in this state serving students in any of the grades kindergarten through 12, or as a full-time police officer on the campus of an institution governed by the Tennessee board of regents, without loss or suspension of the retired member's retirement benefits, if certain conditions are met. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8 and Title 49, relative to school safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2387 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee