TN SB2534 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the superintendent of a workhouse to keep a record of the height and weight of each inmate in addition to the inmate's age, sex, complexion, color of hair and eyes, and nationality. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 41.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8 and Title 41, relative to persons convicted of a criminal offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2700 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee